Jinapriya, Delan (CPSO#: 79376)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Galen Eye Centre
Suite 100
27 Place d'Armes
Kingston ON  K7K 6Z6
Phone: (613) 507-4800
Fax: (613) 507-4801
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock St.
Kingston, ON
K7L 5G2
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Canada
Phone: (613) 533-2559
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Jinapriya Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jinapriya ( CPSO# 79376 )

Business Address:
Suite 100
27 Place D'Armes
Kingston ON  K7K 6Z6
Phone Number: (613) 507-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DELAN JINAPRIYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JINAPRIYA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008