Jindal, Sanjay Kumar (CPSO#: 62217)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
106-348 Muskoka Rd 3N
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 787-1491
Fax: (705) 789-6330
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sanjay Jindal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Jindal ( CPSO# 65077 )
Dr. S. Jindal ( CPSO# 62217 )

Business Address:
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Unit 106
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 787-1491

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJAY KUMAR JINDAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JINDAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1992