Jivanji, Nissreen (CPSO#: 79843)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
250 dundas st west
unit 106
Mississauga ON  L5B1J2
Phone: 905-275-2273
Fax: (905) 275-2297
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jivanji-Taher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jivanji ( CPSO# 79843 )
Dr. F. Taher ( CPSO# 64606 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
Queensway Site
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A4
Phone Number: (416) 521-4196

Business Address:
2444 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V1
Phone Number: (905) 566-1414

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NISSREEN JIVANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIVANJI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2005