Joannou, Manuela Helene Elizabeth (CPSO#: 62239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: McKirdy, Manuela Helene Elizabeth (used until: 05 Aug 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
279 Canal Bank Road
PO Box 20107
Perth ON  K7H 3M6
Phone: (613) 267-9888
Fax: (613) 267-8791
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Manuela Joannou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Joannou ( CPSO# 62239 )

Business Address:
279 Canal Bank Road
PO Box 20107
Perth ON  K7H 3M6
Phone Number: (613) 267-9888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANUELA HELENE ELIZABETH JOANNOU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOANNOU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 1991