Jocic, Dragana Anna (CPSO#: 72270)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
701 Main St. West
Suite 100
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A2
Phone: (289)768 7246
Fax: (289)779 2273
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Terrace Hill St.
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Canada
Phone: (519)753 7871
Fax: (519)751 5579
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dragana Anna Jocic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jocic ( CPSO# 72270 )

Business Address:
Unit 100
701 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A2
Phone Number: (289) 768-7246

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DRAGANA ANNA JOCIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOCIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2000