Johal, Rupinder Kaur (CPSO#: 94059)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Government Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

390 STEELES AVE WEST
Suite # 208
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Canada
Phone: 9057099696
Fax: (905) 709-9764
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Singh & Johal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Singh ( CPSO# 99651 )
Dr. R. Johal ( CPSO# 94059 )

Business Address:
2945 Sandalwood Parkway
Brampton ON  L6R 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 463-1337

Business Address:
90 Resolution Drive
Brampton ON  L6W 0A7
Phone Number: (416) 883-3877

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 May 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RUPINDER KAUR JOHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 11 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 12 Feb 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 11 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 12 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 11 Feb 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 12 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Feb 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 11 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016