John, Usha Susan (CPSO#: 82074)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:University of Kerala, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
3rd Floor
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-6877
Fax: (905) 721-6686
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Usha John Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. U. John ( CPSO# 82074 )

Business Address:
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
3rd Floor
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-6877

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Dec 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. USHA SUSAN JOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 25 Mar 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2008