Johnson, Benjamin John (CPSO#: 86783)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 May 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Winsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Ave
Windsor ON  N8S 1S6
Phone: (519) 254-5577
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4411
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Benjamin Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 09 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Johnson ( CPSO# 86783 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital, Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4411

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BENJAMIN JOHN JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2013