Johnson, David Walter (CPSO#: 61230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
695 Canterbury Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 8W7
Phone: (519) 537-5052
Fax: (519) 539-0476
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lasik MD
320 Dundas St. Unit 5
London ON
London ON  N6B 3R8
Canada
Phone: 519 963 0911
Fax: 519 963 0912
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Lasik MD
276 Mud St.
Hamilton
Hamilton ON  L8J 3Z6
Canada
Phone: 866 953 1515
Fax: 905 560 4282
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Lasik MD
101 Frederick St.
Kitchener
Kitchener ON  N2H 6R3
Canada
Phone: 519 772 2020
Fax: 519 772 1284
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David W. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Johnson ( CPSO# 61230 )

Business Address:
2 - 695 Canterbury Street
Woodstock ON  N4S 8W7
Phone Number: (519) 537-5052

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Hospital Ingersoll
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID WALTER JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1990