Johnson, Kassia Jeannette (CPSO#: 79125)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Oct 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ron Joyce Childrens Health Centre
3Rd Floor
325 Wellington Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 74275
Fax: (905) 521-7953
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bethesda Community Services
3280 Schmon Parkway
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Canada
Phone: (905) 684-6918
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
McMaster Children's Hospital,Division of Pediatric Critical Care Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KASSIA JEANNETTE JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2008