Johnson, Manamohan (CPSO#: 64559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
77 Queensway West
Suite 212
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B7
Phone: (905) 848-8677
Fax: (905) 848-5855
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System at
Etobicoke General Hospital and
Brampton Civic Hospital
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 747-3400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Johnson ( CPSO# 64559 )

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (905) 848-8677

Business Address:
77 Queensway West
Suite 212
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B7
Phone Number: (905) 848-8677

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANAMOHAN JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 30 Aug 1991 to 31 Jul 1992
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1992