Johnson, Melissa Anne (CPSO#: 84406)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Medical Oncology
London Regional Cancer Program
790 Comissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: 519 685-8640
Fax: 519 685-8624
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Hematology Oncology
London Regional Cancer Program
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Canada
Phone: 519 685-8640
Fax: 519 685-8624
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Chatham Kent Health Alliance
PO Box 2030
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Canada
Phone: (519) 352-6400 Ext. 6682
Fax: (519) 437-6064
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melissa A. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Johnson ( CPSO# 84406 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Program
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8640

Business Address:
Chatham Kent Health Alliance
80 Grand Avenue West
P.O. Box 2030
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Oct 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA ANNE JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2008