Johnson, Natasha Ingrid (CPSO#: 76761)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
1280 Main Street West
HSC, Department of Pediatrics, 3A36
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75658
Fax: (905) 308-7548
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Natasha Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Johnson ( CPSO# 76761 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
HSC Department of Pediatrics
Room 3A36
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NATASHA INGRID JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2002