Johnson, Richard Leslie (CPSO#: 22054)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard L. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 22 2009


Corporation Name: Richard L. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 15 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012