Johnson, Sarah Augusta (CPSO#: 88731)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah A. Johnson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Johnson ( CPSO# 88731 )

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 346-4800

Business Address:
Unit 562
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4200

Business Address:
Unit 256
399 Bathurst Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5801

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Phone Number: (416) 323-6400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH AUGUSTA JOHNSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 05 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2015