Johnston, Eamon Francis (CPSO#: 56018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A2
525 Saginaw Parkway
Cambridge ON  N1T 2A6
Phone: (519) 622-6722
Fax: (519) 623-4989
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

631 Queenston Rd
Stoney Creek ON  L8K 6R5
Canada
Phone: (905) 578-9255
Fax: (519) 623-4989
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E F Johnston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Johnston ( CPSO# 56018 )

Business Address:
A2 - 525 Saginaw Parkway
Cambridge ON  N1T 0C3
Phone Number: (519) 622-6722

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may write to: Attention: Stephanie Lablack 453 Park Street Kitchener, Ontario N2G 1N5 Fax: (519) 743-6477
Date Received: 20 Dec 2011


Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may email Dr. Johnston at: cornwallmedicalrecords@gmail.com
Date Received: 24 Mar 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EAMON FRANCIS JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1988