Johnston, Kenneth Wayne (CPSO#: 21736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Nov 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Nov 1968

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vascular Laboratory
6th Floor, Eaton Wing
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 2584343
Fax: (416) 340-5029
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Wayne Johnston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Johnston ( CPSO# 21736 )

Business Address:
Suite 216
6th Floor Eaton Wing
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1971 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KENNETH WAYNE JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1968