Johnston, Kevin (CPSO#: 71204)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 31 Oct 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: Speight, Kevin Richard (used until: 18 Nov 2014 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Johnston Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 31 2017

Hospital Privileges

No Privileges reported.

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  November 24, 2011
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On December 7, 2011, Trillium Health Centre notified the College that Dr. Kevin Johnston's (formerly Kevin Richard Speight) privileges are suspended, effective November 24, 2011.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1999
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2012
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 31 Oct 2016

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 31 Oct 2016
Summary:

On October 31, 2016, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons 
of Ontario found that Dr. Kevin Johnston engaged in professional misconduct in that he has 
engaged in conduct unbecoming a physician. 
 
Dr. Johnston, a 44 year old family physician, was formerly known as Kevin Richard 
Speight, under which name he practised medicine until November 2014. He has not 
practised medicine since March 17, 2016. 
 
Dr. Johnston has previously practised in Toronto, Cambridge, St. Catharines, and 
Mississauga. Most recently, in 2015 and 2016 he practised in Guelph and Kitchener. 
  
ACCESSING, PURCHASING, AND POSSESSING CHILD PORNOGRAPHY 
 
In October 2010, Dr. Johnston visited a website, Azov Films, which sold movies and photo 
collections, including child pornography. Dr. Johnston accessed and purchased child 
pornography depicting nude pubescent and pre-pubescent boys. Specifically,  
   -  Before making his purchases, Dr. Johnston accessed child pornography on the Azov 
      Films website, including flash video files and compressed container files with 
      various movie trailers and JPEG images.  
   -  On October 16 and 17, 2010, Dr. Johnston purchased 16 discs containing collections 
      of photos from Azov Films. Fourteen of these photo discs contain child 
      pornography.  
   -  On October 16, 17, and 18, 2010, Dr. Johnston downloaded the photo discs 
      described above to a computer in his home.  
 
The Toronto Police identified orders that Dr. Johnston placed on the website to purchase 
photo collections and Dr. Johnston’s downloads of the photo collections that he purchased. 
Dr. Johnston’s purchases were also confirmed by Dr. Johnston’s credit card statement, 
obtained by the College. 
 
Dr. Johnston was acquitted of criminal charges in relation to the purchases described above 
on May 29, 2013. The Court found that the Crown had not led any evidence of an essential 
element of the offence, namely that Dr. Johnston knew the nature and content of the images 
that he ordered.  
 
The College requested a further report from the Toronto Police Service addressing this 
issue, which it received in August 2015. The report confirms that Dr. Johnston was aware 
of the nature and content of the child pornography that he purchased, and in particular that 
he had accessed various movie trailers and images containing child pornography before he 
purchased photo collections.  
 
The child pornography in issue in this case did not contain explicit sexual activity or 
violence. 
 
SURREPTITIOUS VIDEO RECORDING 


 
 

 
During the execution of a search warrant at Dr. Johnston’s residence on November 24, 
2011, Toronto police seized an “Angel Eye” mini video recording system, a micro SD card, 
and an Apple iPhone.  The video recording system was equipped with a small camera 
attached by a cord and an empty slot capable of housing a micro SD card.  
 
The mini SD card contained four videos date stamped 2007.08.26. Two of the videos 
contained images of Dr. Johnston, his cat, and his residence.  
 
The other two videos contained footage from a public bathroom. In particular, there was 
footage which Dr. Johnston had surreptitiously filmed of an unknown male defecating in a 
bathroom stall.   
 
On the Apple iPhone, other videos and images were taken in public washrooms as well, 
including a surreptitious video which Dr. Johnston had made of a male urinating into a 
public urinal, made through a peep hole.  
 
In 2012, after the events in issue, Dr. Kevin Johnston (“Dr. Johnston”) was diagnosed with 
bipolar disorder. 
 
Dr. Johnston entered into a recognizance of bail on November 25, 2011, after he was 
charged criminally. Among other things, it restricted Dr. Johnston from being alone with 
anyone under 18 years of age, including while he practiced as a physician. His bail was 
varied on February 16, 2012 and March 1, 2012.   
 
After the College was made aware of the charges against Dr. Johnston, an investigator was 
appointed pursuant to section 75(1)(a) of the Health Professions Procedural Code on March 
20, 2012.  
 
At the College’s request, Dr. Johnston voluntarily entered into an undertaking on November 
5, 2012 that mirrored the terms of his criminal recognizance, so that the College could 
monitor Dr. Johnston’s compliance. This undertaking remained in effect after Dr. 
Johnston’s criminal process came to an end.   
 
After allegations against Dr. Johnston were referred to the Discipline Committee, the 
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of the College provided Dr. Johnston with 
notice that it intended to impose an interim order against him pending resolution of the 
discipline allegations.  
 
In response, Dr. Johnston entered into a new voluntary undertaking (replacing the 2012 
undertaking) dated March 17, 2016 which required him to have a College-approved 
practice monitor for all professional encounters with patients under the age of 18, until the 
allegations against him were resolved.  
 
Subsequently, Dr. Johnston chose to cease practising medicine until the hearing.  


 
 

 
PENALTY 
 
On October 31, 2016, the Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
   -  The Registrar revoke Dr. Johnston’s certificate of registration, effective 
      immediately. 
   -  Dr. Johnston appear before the Panel to be reprimanded 
   -  Dr. Johnston pay costs to the College in the amount of $5,000.00 within thirty (30) 
      days of the date of this Order.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Hearing Date(s): October 31, 2016