Johnston, Sarah Jane (CPSO#: 86922)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dover Cliffs Long Term Care
501 St. George St.
Port Dover
Port Dover ON  N0A 1N0
Phone: (519) 583-1422
Fax: (519) 583-3197
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Norfolk General Hospital
365 West St.
Simcoe, ON
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Johnston and Dr. Luyt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Luyt ( CPSO# 86596 )
Dr. S. Johnston ( CPSO# 86922 )

Business Address:
Norfolk General Hospital
365 West Street
Simcoe ON  N3Y 1T7
Phone Number: (519) 426-0130

Business Address:
75 Parkview Road
Hagersville ON  N0A 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 768-3311

Business Address:
501 St. George Street
Port Dover ON  N0A 1N0
Phone Number: (519) 583-1422

Business Address:
29 Noxon Street
Ingersoll ON  N5C 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 485-1700

Business Address:
167 Ralph Street
Tillsonburg ON  N4G 3Y9
Phone Number: (519) 842-3611

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Norfolk General Hospital Simcoe

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 07 Jul 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH JANE JOHNSTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOHNSTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2010