Joneja, Mala (CPSO#: 67896)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2004 Etherington Hall
Queen's University
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-3230
Fax: (613) 533-3244
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joneja & Gill Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Joneja ( CPSO# 67896 )
Dr. S. Gill ( CPSO# 71319 )

Business Address:
Providence Care Hospital
D1.539J
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3

Business Address:
2004 Etherington Hall
Queen's University
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-3230

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 07 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MALA JONEJA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONEJA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1999