Jones, Claire Ann (CPSO#: 86535)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Fertility
Suite 300
9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone: (416) 586-8554
Fax: 905-303-3136
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Fertility
Suite 700
250 Dundas St. West
Toronto ON  M5T 2Z5
Canada
Phone: 416-586-4748
Fax: 416-586-4686
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility Effective: 31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLAIRE ANN JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology & Infertility

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012