Jones, David Harold Douglas (CPSO#: 58220)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1988

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
General Dynamics Land Systems
1991 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5V2Z7
Phone: 519-946-5450
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hands On Health South Clinic
9A- 769 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 3B9
Canada
Phone: 226-270-1071
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David H.D. Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jones ( CPSO# 58220 )

Business Address:
General Dynamics Land Systems
1991 Oxford Street East
London ON  N5V 2Z7
Phone Number: (519) 946-5450

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Storage & Retrieval Services Inc 111 St Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel (416) 393-0638 or 1-888-563-3732 Fax (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 08 Apr 2014

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID HAROLD DOUGLAS JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1988

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Allegations of Dr. Jones’ professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Jones engaged in sexual abuse and/or disgraceful dishonourable or unprofessional conduct in respect to a patient, including by making remarks and engaging in behaviour of an inappropriate and/or sexual nature.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)