Jones, David Stephen Rhys (CPSO#: 61183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
14 Victoria Street
Thamesville ON  N0P 2K0
Phone: (519) 692-9584
Fax: (519) 692-5905
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Stephen Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jones ( CPSO# 61183 )

Business Address:
14 Victoria Street
Chatham ON  N0P 2K0
Phone Number: (519) 692-9584

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID STEPHEN RHYS JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 May 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jun 1993
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1997