Jones, Jeffery Blaine (CPSO#: 54166)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
722 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 8J8
Phone: (613) 732-1037
Fax: (613) 732-1041
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JB Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jones ( CPSO# 54166 )

Business Address:
722 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 8J8
Phone Number: (613) 732-1037

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 07 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFERY BLAINE JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1984 to 15 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1987