Jones, Julia Jessica (CPSO#: 68089)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-4315
Fax: (905) 721-6647
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Julia Jones Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jones ( CPSO# 68089 )

Business Address:
58 Hoile Drive
Ajax ON  L1Z 1M7
Phone Number: (905) 428-6589

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Business Address:
1300 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-4315

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Bowmanville
47 Liberty Street South
Bowmanville ON  L1C 2N4
Phone Number: (905) 623-3331

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JULIA JESSICA JONES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000