Jones-Stokreef, Nicola Jacqueline (CPSO#: 67448)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Aug 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Names: Stokreef, Nicola Jacqueline (used until: 04 May 2003 )     Jones, Nicola Jacqueline (used until: 21 Apr 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
169 Front Street South
Orillia ON  L3V 4S8
Phone: (705) 326-2214 Ext. 3151
Fax: (705) 323-9279
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Stokreef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Stokreef ( CPSO# 63410 )
Dr. N. Jones-Stokreef ( CPSO# 67448 )

Business Address:
Suite 206A
119 Memorial Avenue
Orillia ON  L3V 5X1
Phone Number: (705) 326-6763


Corporation Name: Dr. Nicola Jones-Stokreef Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 11 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Stokreef ( CPSO# 63410 )
Dr. N. Jones-Stokreef ( CPSO# 67448 )

Business Address:
169 Front Street South
Orillia ON  L3V 4S8
Phone Number: (705) 326-2214

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 23 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLA JACQUELINE JONES-STOKREEF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONES-STOKREEF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Sep 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1993