Jong, Roland Chuck Kit (CPSO#: 66899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Aug 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Room 4SE 114
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6334
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-4457
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Roland C. Jong Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Jong ( CPSO# 66899 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4457

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Suite 4SE-114
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6334

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROLAND CHUCK KIT JONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1998