Joo, Daisy Therese (CPSO#: 68148)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: Ip, Daisy Therese (used until: 28 Jun 1999 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NorthYork General Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6520
Fax: (416) 756-6582
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1333 Sheppard Ave. East
Suite 345
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: (416) 391-4048
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

162 Cumberland St., Suite 225
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5
Canada
Phone: (416) 925-9113
Fax: (416) 925-3336
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daisy Therese Joo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Joo ( CPSO# 68148 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Business Address:
Suite 225
162 Cumberland Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3N5
Phone Number: (416) 925-9113

Business Address:
1333 Sheppard Ave. East
Suite 345
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 391-4048

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Aug 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAISY THERESE JOO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2000 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 31 Aug 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2000 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 2001