Joseph, Mathew Boniface (CPSO#: 23754)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 23 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malayalam

Education:Karnatak University Dharwar, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mathew Joseph Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 9 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: Aim Health Group 1605 Orleans Boulevard Orleans, Ontario K1C 7E2 Tel: (613) 824-7476
Date Received: 25 Sep 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 Jan 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jul 2015