Josephson, Timothy Blair (CPSO#: 77169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: (416) 603-2581
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Issley Josephson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 27 2017


Corporation Name: Timothy Josephson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Josephson ( CPSO# 77169 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
RFE-GS-480
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3856

Business Address:
11 Zina Street
Orangeville ON  L9W 1E2
Phone Number: (519) 492-8143

Business Address:
9300 Airport Road
Suite 520
Mount Hope ON  L0R 1W0
Phone Number: (289) 426-1133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 26 Aug 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY BLAIR JOSEPHSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSEPHSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Feb 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2008