Joshipura, Mini Gaurav (CPSO#: 81239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:Baroda University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Seniors' Health Clinic
Trillium Health Partners
Queensway Site
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5
Phone: (416) 521-4090
Fax: (416) 521-4116
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Joshipura Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Joshipura ( CPSO# 81239 )

Business Address:
Medical Clinic
Trillium Health Centre
West Toronto Site
150 Sherway Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9C 1A5

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Suite G 253
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MINI GAURAV JOSHIPURA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSHIPURA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009