Jovaisas, Algis Vladas (CPSO#: 29977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 1978

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Lithuanian

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 508
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 233-7426
Fax: (613) 233-9912
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Algis V. Jovaisas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 19 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jovaisas ( CPSO# 29977 )

Business Address:
Suite 508
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 233-7426

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 13 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 27 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALGIS VLADAS JOVAISAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOVAISAS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1978