Joyce, Charles Russell (CPSO#: 100650)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone: (519) 941 7575
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Charles Joyce Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Joyce ( CPSO# 100650)

Business Address:
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2410

Business Address:
Highlands Health Network
140 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X8
Phone Number: (519) 941-7575

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 28 Aug 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES RUSSELL JOYCE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOYCE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2015