Judah, Sybil (CPSO#: 50869)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 650
56 Aberfoyle Crescent
Toronto ON  M8X 2W4
Phone: (416) 237-1455
Fax: (416) 237-1389
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ronald Levine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 50932 )
Dr. S. Judah ( CPSO# 50869 )

Business Address:
300 - 1131A Leslie Street
North York ON  M3C 3L8
Phone Number: (416) 360-7360

Business Address:
Suite 650
56 Aberfoyle Crescent
Toronto ON  M8X 2W4
Phone Number: (416) 236-2581

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000


Corporation Name: Sybil Judah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Levine ( CPSO# 50932 )
Dr. S. Judah ( CPSO# 50869 )

Business Address:
1131 Leslie Street
Suite 300
Toronto ON  M3C 3L8
Phone Number: (416) 360-7360

Business Address:
Suite 650
56 Aberfoyle Crescent
Toronto ON  M8X 2W4
Phone Number: (416) 237-1455

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 01 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYBIL JUDAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUDAH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1987