Junker-Andersen, Lorna Ruth (CPSO#: 50870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King St W
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hospice of Waterloo Region
298 Lawrence
Kitchener ON  N2M 1Y4
Canada
Phone: 519-578-9757 Ext. 2
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Junker-Andersen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Junker-Andersen ( CPSO# 50870 )

Business Address:
298 Lawrence Avenue
Kitchener ON  N2M 1Y4
Phone Number: (519) 578-9757

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1985 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Oct 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORNA RUTH JUNKER-ANDERSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUNKER-ANDERSEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 1985