Kaal, Nuri Issa Mohamed Belkasim (CPSO#: 65656)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Oct 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 1998

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1800 - 8th Street East
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone: (519) 371-7474
Fax: (519) 371-8585
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nuri Kaal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kaal ( CPSO# 65656 )

Business Address:
1800 8th Street East
Suite 7107
Owen Sound ON  N4K 6M9
Phone Number: (519) 371-7474

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Lions Head Site Lions Head
Grey Bruce Health Services,Markdale Site Markdale
Grey Bruce Health Services,Meaford Site Meaford
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton
Kincardine and District Site,South Bruce Grey Health Kincardine

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NURI ISSA MOHAMED BELKASIM KAAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 1998

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: December 9, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Update as of July 10, 2017: The member has completed all elements of this SCERP.


See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)