Kagan, Hershel Hart Bradley (CPSO#: 65585)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 500
267 O'Connor Street
Ottawa ON  K2P 1V3
Phone: (613) 234-5553
Fax: (613) 232-4818
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 200
190 Somerset Street West
Ottawa ON  K2P 0J4
Canada
Phone: (613) 233-9669 Ext. 1
Fax: 613-232-4818
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HERSHEL HART BRADLEY KAGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAGAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jan 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1993