Kagan, Rhoda Sheryl (CPSO#: 64572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Aug 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Aug 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 310
4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 492-5888
Fax: (416) 492-6569
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 404
250 Harding Boulevard
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Canada
Phone: (905) 737-9898
Fax: (905) 737-8583
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rhoda S. Kagan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 19 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kagan ( CPSO# 64572 )

Business Address:
310 - 4800 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 492-5888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 03 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RHODA SHERYL KAGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAGAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Aug 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2006