Kahane, Steven Gary (CPSO#: 66465)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4800 Leslie Street
Suite 311
Willowdale ON  M2J 2K9
Phone: (416) 222-5439
Fax: (416) 229-2513
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steven Kahane Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kahane ( CPSO# 66465 )

Business Address:
Suite 311
4800 Leslie Street
Willowdale ON  M2J 2K9
Phone Number: (416) 222-5439

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN GARY KAHANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAHANE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1995