Kain, Kevin Charles (CPSO#: 32747)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Nov 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Health Network
MaRS Centre
Tmdt 10 351
101 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1L7
Phone: (416) 581-7704
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kevin Kain Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Kain ( CPSO# 32747 )

Business Address:
MARS Toronto Medical Discovery Tower
McLaughlin-Rotman Centre for Global Health
10th Floor Room 351
101 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1L7
Phone Number: (416) 581-7704

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 29 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 12 Apr 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN CHARLES KAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 May 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1991