Kalia, Lorraine Victoria (CPSO#: 84739)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital UHN
Movement Disorders Centre
McL 7th Floor
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-6422
Fax: (416) 603-5004
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kalia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kalia ( CPSO# 84668 )
Dr. L. Kalia ( CPSO# 84739 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
WW-4-428
Division of Neurosurgery
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5866

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORRAINE VICTORIA KALIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2013