Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kalicharran, Ubendranauth (CPSO#: 66643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242 1000 Ext. 48000
Fax: 416 242 1000
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

55 St. Clair Ave. West
Suite 125
Toronto ON  M4V 2Y7
Canada
Phone: (416) 789-5335
Fax: (416) 638-9239
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

6981 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 6B8
Canada
Phone: 289 724 7246
Fax: 289 914 2273
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

300 Fourth Avenue
Unit D
St Catharines ON  L2S 0E6
Canada
Phone: 365 653 7246
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

701 Main Street West
Unit 100
Hamilton ON  L8S 1A2
Canada
Phone: 289 768 7246
Fax: 289 779 2273
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. U. Kalicharran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Kalicharran ( CPSO# 66643 )

Business Address:
6981 Millcreek Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 6B8

Business Address:
300 Fourth Avenue
Unit D
St Catharines ON  L2S 0E6

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2

Business Address:
125 - 55 St. Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 2Y7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UBENDRANAUTH KALICHARRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALICHARRAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998