Kalidindi, Shiva Kumar Raju (CPSO#: 88319)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Kannada, Tamil, Telugu

Education:Bangalore University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shiva Kalidindi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 11 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 May 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 May 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Aug 2013