Kalra, Bharat Bhushan (CPSO#: 59802)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Delhi, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
3251 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3W5
Phone: (416) 492-9880
Fax: (416) 492-9886
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bharat Kalra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kalra ( CPSO# 59802 )
Dr. S. Kalra ( CPSO# 109546)

Business Address:
Suite 104
3251 Sheppard Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1T 3W5
Phone Number: (416) 492-9880

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BHARAT BHUSHAN KALRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALRA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1989