Kalra, Savita (CPSO#: 78123)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Punjabi University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone: (705) 267-2131
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L2E4
Canada
Phone: 7056454404
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Savita Kalra Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kalra ( CPSO# 78123 )

Business Address:
Timmins and District Hospital
700 Ross Avenue East
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Phone Number: (705) 267-6339

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAVITA KALRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KALRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006