Kalu, Uduma Onuka (CPSO#: 28035)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 30 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ibo

Education:George Washington University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Uduma Kalu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 9 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: ODS P.O. Box 2071 Sudbury, ON P3A 4R8 Telephone: 705-560-8461 Email: odstorage@persona.ca
Date Received: 07 Apr 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
Resident 1 - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1975 to 30 Jun 1976
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 3 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Apr 2015

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: April 30, 2015
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Dr. Kalu has agreed to resign from the College as of April 30, 2015 and has agreed never to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.