Kanani, Ronik (CPSO#: 76614)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Calgary, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Paediatrics
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6504
Fax: (416) 756-6274
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kanani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kanani ( CPSO# 76614 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6504

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONIK KANANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005