Kancherla, Yasodhara (CPSO#: 62727)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Oct 1991

Summary

Former Name: Donepudi, Yasodhara (used until: 08 Dec 1992 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Telugu

Education:Andhra University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
1401 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7R 0C2
Phone: (905) 639-3511
Fax: (905) 639-1572
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Y. Kancherla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Kancherla ( CPSO# 62727 )

Business Address:
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4

Business Address:
Suite 3
1401 Plains Road East
Burlington ON  L7R 0C2
Phone Number: (905) 639-3511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 04 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASODHARA KANCHERLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANCHERLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 1991