Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Kannampuzha, Paul Thomas (CPSO#: 59310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
200 Ronson Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9W 5Z9
Phone: (416) 740-7600
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul Kannampuzha Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kannampuzha ( CPSO# 59310 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Suite 104
200 Ronson Drive
Etobicoke ON  M9W 5Z9
Phone Number: (416) 740-7600

Business Address:
Tulip Diagnostic Imaging
Unit 1
229 Broadway
Orangeville ON  L9W 1K4
Phone Number: (519) 943-0022

Business Address:
Brantford Medical Centre
40 Shellington Place
Brantford ON  N3S 0C5
Phone Number: (519) 753-9581

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 23 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL THOMAS KANNAMPUZHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANNAMPUZHA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Jun 1988 to 12 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 5 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1989