Kanya-Forstner, Nicholas George (CPSO#: 65467)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
101 Mall
Suite 208
38 Pine Street North
Timmins ON  P4N 6K6
Phone: (705) 264-5111
Fax: (705) 267-4212
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Kanya-Forstner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kanya-Forstner ( CPSO# 65467 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
38 Pine Street
The 101 Mall
Timmins ON  P4N 6K6
Phone Number: (705) 264-5111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS GEORGE KANYA-FORSTNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANYA-FORSTNER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Other - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1993